House | 05/07/2025 | Postponed | 5/9/25 10:00 AM | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Vote reconsidered | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1690 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 672 | |
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 672 | |
House | 02/18/2025 | Filed |