Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2997 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/18/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R11000 BCH-F
 By: Bryant H.B. No. 2997




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the temperature at which certain facilities operated by
 the Texas Department of Criminal Justice are maintained.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 501, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 501.028 and 501.029 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.028.  TEMPERATURE REQUIREMENTS AT DEPARTMENT
 FACILITIES. (a)  The department shall ensure that the temperature
 in each facility operated by the department and used to house
 inmates or in which department staff regularly work is maintained
 at not less than 65 degrees Fahrenheit or more than 85 degrees
 Fahrenheit.
 (b)  The department shall install and maintain an electronic
 temperature gauge in the following areas of each facility described
 by Subsection (a):
 (1)  hospitals;
 (2)  visiting areas;
 (3)  housing or dormitory areas;
 (4)  trustee areas;
 (5)  areas used for medical treatment or care,
 including areas used for dispensing medication to inmates;
 (6)  kitchens or dining areas;
 (7)  food preparation areas;
 (8)  community areas, including dayrooms;
 (9)  laundry areas;
 (10)  areas used for work stations;
 (11)  indoor recreational areas, including gymnasiums;
 (12)  restroom and shower areas and other areas related
 to inmate hygiene;
 (13)  administrative areas;
 (14)  correctional officer stations, including guard
 post areas;
 (15)  commissary areas;
 (16)  areas used for programmatic, educational, or
 vocational purposes;
 (17)  chapels or churches;
 (18)  libraries; and
 (19)  maintenance areas.
 (c)  The department shall:
 (1)  maintain a log of the temperatures recorded by
 each electronic temperature gauge under Subsection (b) on an hourly
 basis in an electronic format; and
 (2)  publish the log, at least quarterly, on the
 department's publicly accessible Internet website.
 Sec. 501.029.  REPORT REGARDING AIR CONDITIONING. Not later
 than December 1 of each year, the department shall submit to the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and each standing committee of the legislature
 with primary jurisdiction over the department a report regarding
 air conditioning in facilities operated by the department and used
 to house inmates or in which department staff regularly work. The
 report must include the following information for the preceding
 12-month period:
 (1)  the number of facilities in which the air
 conditioning system has failed;
 (2)  the number of incidents in which the air
 conditioning in a facility was not operational and the reason for
 each incident;
 (3)  the number of incidents in which the temperature
 was not maintained at the temperature range required under Section
 501.028(a) and the reason for each incident;
 (4)  for each incident described by Subdivision (2)
 that was due to an equipment malfunction, a summary of the steps
 taken by the department to address the malfunction and ensure the
 well-being of inmates and staff at the facility; and
 (5)  for each incident described by Subdivision (3), a
 summary of the steps taken by the department to address the cause of
 the incident and ensure the well-being of inmates and staff at the
 facility.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice is
 not required to fully comply with the requirements of Section
 501.028, Government Code, as added by this Act, until September 1,
 2026.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2026, the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each
 standing committee of the legislature with primary jurisdiction
 over the department a report regarding the department's progress
 toward complying with Section 501.028, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, in all facilities to which that section applies.
 (c)  The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall submit
 the first report required by Section 501.029, Government Code, as
 added by this Act, not later than December 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of
 two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by
 Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not
 receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes
 effect September 1, 2025.
 (b)  Section 501.029, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 takes effect September 1, 2027.