Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3032 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/22/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
04/22/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar