Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#770 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2099 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2094 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#770 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2012 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#693 | Journal Page: 2011 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2008 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2011 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 02/20/2025 | Filed |