Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2025
Fiscal Note February 20, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 16, 2025
Analysis April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note April 16, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2025
Fiscal Note April 7, 2025