Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call