Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1282 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2667 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2667 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1175 | Journal Page: 2537 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2537 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1175 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 716 | |
House | 03/21/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 716 | |
House | 02/25/2025 | Filed |