Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3323 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/03/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:57PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars