Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule