House
|
05/05/2025
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 1369
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Postponed
|
5/5/25 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2204
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Postponed 5/5/25 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|