Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB341 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/29/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/29/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/03/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Transportation
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed