Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3434 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/22/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 3:55PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
04/22/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 3:55PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar