LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB3446
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3446
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3446
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/31/2025
2:00 pm
S/C on Family & Fiduciary Relationships Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
HB368
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
HB3311
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB1734
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
HB2495
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
HB2716
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB793
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
HB3376
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
HB2524
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3421
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
HB3446
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3181
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House