Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3455 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/02/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule