Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3458 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/09/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee