Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3461 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R10662 RDR-F
 By: Bonnen H.B. No. 3461




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain memorial markers and designations on highways
 in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 201.911, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "victim" means a person killed in a
 highway collision while operating or riding on a motorcycle. The
 term does not include a person who was under the influence of
 alcohol or a controlled substance at the time of the collision.
 (c)  A sign designed and posted under this section shall
 include:
 (1)  a motorcyclist safety message selected from the
 options provided by commission rule under Subsection (c-1) [red
 cross];
 (2)  the phrase "In Memory Of" and the name of one or
 more victims in accordance with the commission rule; and
 (3)  the date of the collision that resulted in the
 victim's death.
 (c-1)  The commission by rule shall develop motorcyclist
 safety messages that may be used on the memorial signs under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 225.021, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Subject to Subsection (e), the [The] department shall
 repair and replace each marker required by this subchapter and
 maintain the grounds for the marker.
 (e)  The department may not repair or replace a marker after
 the 10th anniversary of the effective date of the provision
 requiring the marker to be erected unless a grant or donation of
 funds is made to the department to cover the cost of the repair or
 replacement of the marker. This subsection applies only to a
 provision of this subchapter enacted after January 1, 2025, that
 requires the erection of a marker.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Texas
 Transportation Commission shall adopt the rules required by Section
 201.911(c-1), Transportation Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 201.911, Transportation Code,
 as amended by this Act, the Texas Department of Transportation is
 not required to comply with the changes in law made by this Act
 before March 1, 2026.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.