Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#994 | Journal Page: 2320 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2320 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2182 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#847 | Journal Page: 2177 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#847 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended | 2-Ancha | Journal Page: 2177 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended 2-Anchía | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amendment to amendment tabled | 3-Isaac | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-Ancha | Journal Page: 2180 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Amendment to amendment tabled 3-Isaac | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amendment(s) offered 2-Anchía | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended 1-Anchía | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 737 | |
House | 03/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 737 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Filed |