Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#739 | Journal Page: 2073 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1964 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#643 | Journal Page: 1961 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1961 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1961 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 737 | |
House | 03/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 737 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Filed |