Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#763 | Journal Page: 2093 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#679 | Journal Page: 1999 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1999 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2000 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#679 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended | 1-Barry | Journal Page: 1993 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#678 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1993 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended 1-Barry | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1532 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 756 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 756 | |
House | 03/03/2025 | Filed |