House | 05/05/2025 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1012 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2334 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1012 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2334 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2203 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#867 | Journal Page: 2202 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2197 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development | Journal Page: 765 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 765 | |
House | 03/04/2025 | Filed |