Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3698 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2025
Fiscal Note March 4, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 21, 2025
Analysis April 21, 2025
Fiscal Note April 21, 2025
Bill April 21, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2025
Analysis April 17, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2025
Fiscal Note April 10, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2025