Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1425
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#384
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#330
|
Journal Page: 1606
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1614
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Record vote RV#330
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Luther
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Record vote RV#329
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Amended 1-Luther
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Luther
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Luther
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency
|
|
Journal Page: 765
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 765
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|