Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2699 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1316 | Journal Page: 2698 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2698 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2698 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1213 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1213 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 1-Manuel | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended 1-Manuel | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2574 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 780 | |
House | 03/04/2025 | Filed |