House | 05/02/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 780 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 780 | |
House | 03/04/2025 | Filed |