Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3758 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025 2:00 pm
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 1:49PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/14/2025 2:00 pm
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 1:49PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted