Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB376 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/27/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in committee