House | 04/28/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1985 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1879 | Journal Page: 1984 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1532 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |