Senate | 05/07/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1630 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3014 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1559 | Journal Page: 3014 |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3014 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3014 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2262 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |