LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB3797
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB3797
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3797
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/15/2025
8:00 am
Public Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 140
HB1178
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1411
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1441
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1773
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1813
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2107
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2598
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2911
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB2967
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3672
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5263
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB3797
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/15/2025
8:00 am
Public Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 140
HB1178
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1411
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1441
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1773
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1813
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2107
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2598
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2911
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB2967
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3672
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB5263
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB3797
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars