Senate | 05/06/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1398 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Amended | 1-Orr | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Amended 1-Orr | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed | 5/5/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2576 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2576 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed 5/5/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 784 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 784 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |