Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1756 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2467 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2079 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#751 | Journal Page: 2083 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#751 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2078 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#658 | Journal Page: 1974 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1974 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#658 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1978 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 785 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 785 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |