Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3895 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/16/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:47PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/16/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:47PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule