Senate | 04/16/2025 | Referred to Vet Affairs | Journal Page: 1350 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1350 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote | RV#175 | Journal Page: 1371 |
House | 04/15/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1391 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1391 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1357 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Record vote | RV#160 | Journal Page: 1337 |
House | 04/14/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1357 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Amended | 1-Toth and J. Garcia | Journal Page: 1356 |
House | 04/14/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1356 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 880 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 403 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 403 | |
House | 03/03/2025 | Filed |