Senate | 04/24/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1485 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#481 | Journal Page: 1767 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1767 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#481 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1755 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1708 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 1707 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1707 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#437 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 348 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |