1 | 1 | | 89R3806 DRS-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Tepper H.B. No. 398 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to the limitations on increases in the appraised value of |
---|
10 | 10 | | certain property for ad valorem tax purposes. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Section 23.23(a), Tax Code, is amended to read as |
---|
13 | 13 | | follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (a) Notwithstanding the requirements of Section 25.18 and |
---|
15 | 15 | | regardless of whether the appraisal office has appraised the |
---|
16 | 16 | | property and determined the market value of the property for the tax |
---|
17 | 17 | | year, an appraisal office may increase the appraised value of a |
---|
18 | 18 | | residence homestead for a tax year to an amount not to exceed the |
---|
19 | 19 | | lesser of: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) the market value of the property for the most |
---|
21 | 21 | | recent tax year that the market value was determined by the |
---|
22 | 22 | | appraisal office; or |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2) the sum of: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (A) 2.5 [10] percent of the appraised value of |
---|
25 | 25 | | the property for the preceding tax year; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (B) the appraised value of the property for the |
---|
27 | 27 | | preceding tax year; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (C) the market value of all new improvements to |
---|
29 | 29 | | the property. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 2. Sections 23.231(a), (d), and (g), Tax Code, are |
---|
31 | 31 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (a) In this section: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) ["Consumer price index" means the average over a |
---|
34 | 34 | | state fiscal year of the Consumer Price Index for All Urban |
---|
35 | 35 | | Consumers (CPI-U), U.S. City Average, published monthly by the |
---|
36 | 36 | | United States Bureau of Labor Statistics, or its successor in |
---|
37 | 37 | | function. |
---|
38 | 38 | | [(2)] "Disaster recovery program" means a disaster |
---|
39 | 39 | | recovery program funded with community development block grant |
---|
40 | 40 | | disaster recovery money authorized by federal law. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) [(3)] "New improvement" means an improvement to |
---|
42 | 42 | | real property made after the most recent appraisal of the property |
---|
43 | 43 | | that increases the market value of the property and the value of |
---|
44 | 44 | | which is not included in the appraised value of the property for the |
---|
45 | 45 | | preceding tax year. The term does not include repairs to or |
---|
46 | 46 | | ordinary maintenance of an existing structure or the grounds or |
---|
47 | 47 | | another feature of the property. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (d) Notwithstanding the requirements of Section 25.18 and |
---|
49 | 49 | | regardless of whether the appraisal office has appraised the |
---|
50 | 50 | | property and determined the market value of the property for the tax |
---|
51 | 51 | | year, an appraisal office may increase the appraised value of real |
---|
52 | 52 | | property to which this section applies for a tax year to an amount |
---|
53 | 53 | | not to exceed the lesser of: |
---|
54 | 54 | | (1) the market value of the property for the most |
---|
55 | 55 | | recent tax year that the market value was determined by the |
---|
56 | 56 | | appraisal office; or |
---|
57 | 57 | | (2) the sum of: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (A) eight [20] percent of the appraised value of |
---|
59 | 59 | | the property for the preceding tax year; |
---|
60 | 60 | | (B) the appraised value of the property for the |
---|
61 | 61 | | preceding tax year; and |
---|
62 | 62 | | (C) the market value of all new improvements to |
---|
63 | 63 | | the property. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (g) For purposes of Subsection (f): |
---|
65 | 65 | | (1) [,] a person who, before the 2023 tax year, |
---|
66 | 66 | | acquired real property to which this section applied as this |
---|
67 | 67 | | section existed on January 1, 2024, [applies before the 2023 tax |
---|
68 | 68 | | year] is considered to have acquired the property on January 1, |
---|
69 | 69 | | 2023; and |
---|
70 | 70 | | (2) a person who, before the 2025 tax year, acquired |
---|
71 | 71 | | real property, other than property described by Subdivision (1), to |
---|
72 | 72 | | which this section applies is considered to have acquired the |
---|
73 | 73 | | property on January 1, 2025. |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECTION 3. Section 25.19(o), Tax Code, is amended to read as |
---|
75 | 75 | | follows: |
---|
76 | 76 | | (o) A notice required under Subsection (a) or (g) to be |
---|
77 | 77 | | delivered to the owner of real property other than a single-family |
---|
78 | 78 | | residence that qualifies for an exemption under Section 11.13 must |
---|
79 | 79 | | include the following statement: "Under Section 23.231, Tax Code, |
---|
80 | 80 | | [for the 2024, 2025, and 2026 tax years,] the appraised value of |
---|
81 | 81 | | real property other than a residence homestead for ad valorem tax |
---|
82 | 82 | | purposes may not be increased by more than eight [20] percent each |
---|
83 | 83 | | year, with certain exceptions." [The circuit breaker limitation |
---|
84 | 84 | | provided under Section 23.231, Tax Code, expires December 31, 2026. |
---|
85 | 85 | | Unless this expiration date is extended by the Texas Legislature, |
---|
86 | 86 | | beginning in the 2027 tax year, the circuit breaker limitation |
---|
87 | 87 | | provided under Section 23.231, Tax Code, will no longer be in effect |
---|
88 | 88 | | and may result in an increase in ad valorem taxes imposed on real |
---|
89 | 89 | | property previously subject to the limitation." This subsection |
---|
90 | 90 | | expires December 31, 2027.] |
---|
91 | 91 | | SECTION 4. The following provisions are repealed: |
---|
92 | 92 | | (1) Sections 23.231(b), (j), and (k), Tax Code; |
---|
93 | 93 | | (2) Section 4.02, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th |
---|
94 | 94 | | Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Section |
---|
95 | 95 | | 1.12(d), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027; |
---|
96 | 96 | | (3) Section 4.05, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th |
---|
97 | 97 | | Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Sections |
---|
98 | 98 | | 25.19(b) and (g), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027; |
---|
99 | 99 | | (4) Section 4.08, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th |
---|
100 | 100 | | Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Section |
---|
101 | 101 | | 41.41(a), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027; |
---|
102 | 102 | | (5) Section 4.10, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th |
---|
103 | 103 | | Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Section |
---|
104 | 104 | | 42.26(d), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027; and |
---|
105 | 105 | | (6) Section 4.12, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th |
---|
106 | 106 | | Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Sections |
---|
107 | 107 | | 403.302(d) and (i), Government Code, as effective January 1, 2027. |
---|
108 | 108 | | SECTION 5. This Act applies only to the appraisal of |
---|
109 | 109 | | property for ad valorem tax purposes for a tax year that begins on |
---|
110 | 110 | | or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
111 | 111 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect January 1, 2026, but only |
---|
112 | 112 | | if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature, |
---|
113 | 113 | | Regular Session, 2025, to authorize the legislature to set lower |
---|
114 | 114 | | limits on the maximum appraised value of residence homesteads and |
---|
115 | 115 | | of real property other than a residence homestead for ad valorem tax |
---|
116 | 116 | | purposes and to make permanent the limit on the maximum appraised |
---|
117 | 117 | | value of real property other than a residence homestead is approved |
---|
118 | 118 | | by the voters. If that amendment is not approved by the voters, |
---|
119 | 119 | | this Act has no effect. |
---|