Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB398 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R3806 DRS-D
 By: Tepper H.B. No. 398




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the limitations on increases in the appraised value of
 certain property for ad valorem tax purposes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 23.23(a), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding the requirements of Section 25.18 and
 regardless of whether the appraisal office has appraised the
 property and determined the market value of the property for the tax
 year, an appraisal office may increase the appraised value of a
 residence homestead for a tax year to an amount not to exceed the
 lesser of:
 (1)  the market value of the property for the most
 recent tax year that the market value was determined by the
 appraisal office; or
 (2)  the sum of:
 (A)  2.5 [10] percent of the appraised value of
 the property for the preceding tax year;
 (B)  the appraised value of the property for the
 preceding tax year; and
 (C)  the market value of all new improvements to
 the property.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 23.231(a), (d), and (g), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  ["Consumer price index" means the average over a
 state fiscal year of the Consumer Price Index for All Urban
 Consumers (CPI-U), U.S. City Average, published monthly by the
 United States Bureau of Labor Statistics, or its successor in
 function.
 [(2)]  "Disaster recovery program" means a disaster
 recovery program funded with community development block grant
 disaster recovery money authorized by federal law.
 (2) [(3)]  "New improvement" means an improvement to
 real property made after the most recent appraisal of the property
 that increases the market value of the property and the value of
 which is not included in the appraised value of the property for the
 preceding tax year. The term does not include repairs to or
 ordinary maintenance of an existing structure or the grounds or
 another feature of the property.
 (d)  Notwithstanding the requirements of Section 25.18 and
 regardless of whether the appraisal office has appraised the
 property and determined the market value of the property for the tax
 year, an appraisal office may increase the appraised value of real
 property to which this section applies for a tax year to an amount
 not to exceed the lesser of:
 (1)  the market value of the property for the most
 recent tax year that the market value was determined by the
 appraisal office; or
 (2)  the sum of:
 (A)  eight [20] percent of the appraised value of
 the property for the preceding tax year;
 (B)  the appraised value of the property for the
 preceding tax year; and
 (C)  the market value of all new improvements to
 the property.
 (g)  For purposes of Subsection (f):
 (1)  [,] a person who, before the 2023 tax year,
 acquired real property to which this section applied as this
 section existed on January 1, 2024, [applies before the 2023 tax
 year] is considered to have acquired the property on January 1,
 2023; and
 (2)  a person who, before the 2025 tax year, acquired
 real property, other than property described by Subdivision (1), to
 which this section applies is considered to have acquired the
 property on January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  Section 25.19(o), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (o)  A notice required under Subsection (a) or (g) to be
 delivered to the owner of real property other than a single-family
 residence that qualifies for an exemption under Section 11.13 must
 include the following statement: "Under Section 23.231, Tax Code,
 [for the 2024, 2025, and 2026 tax years,] the appraised value of
 real property other than a residence homestead for ad valorem tax
 purposes may not be increased by more than eight [20] percent each
 year, with certain exceptions." [The circuit breaker limitation
 provided under Section 23.231, Tax Code, expires December 31, 2026.
 Unless this expiration date is extended by the Texas Legislature,
 beginning in the 2027 tax year, the circuit breaker limitation
 provided under Section 23.231, Tax Code, will no longer be in effect
 and may result in an increase in ad valorem taxes imposed on real
 property previously subject to the limitation." This subsection
 expires December 31, 2027.]
 SECTION 4.  The following provisions are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 23.231(b), (j), and (k), Tax Code;
 (2)  Section 4.02, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Section
 1.12(d), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027;
 (3)  Section 4.05, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Sections
 25.19(b) and (g), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027;
 (4)  Section 4.08, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Section
 41.41(a), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027;
 (5)  Section 4.10, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Section
 42.26(d), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027; and
 (6)  Section 4.12, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Sections
 403.302(d) and (i), Government Code, as effective January 1, 2027.
 SECTION 5.  This Act applies only to the appraisal of
 property for ad valorem tax purposes for a tax year that begins on
 or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2026, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2025, to authorize the legislature to set lower
 limits on the maximum appraised value of residence homesteads and
 of real property other than a residence homestead for ad valorem tax
 purposes and to make permanent the limit on the maximum appraised
 value of real property other than a residence homestead is approved
 by the voters. If that amendment is not approved by the voters,
 this Act has no effect.