1 | 1 | | 89R14160 MPF-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Walle H.B. No. 3989 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to the establishment of the supporting life pilot program |
---|
10 | 10 | | as part of the Thriving Texas Families Program. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 54, Health and Safety Code, as added by |
---|
13 | 13 | | Chapter 1033 (S.B. 24), Acts of the 88th Legislature, Regular |
---|
14 | 14 | | Session, 2023, is amended by adding Section 54.012 to read as |
---|
15 | 15 | | follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 54.012. SUPPORTING LIFE PILOT PROGRAM. (a) In this |
---|
17 | 17 | | section: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (1) "Advisory board" means the supporting life pilot |
---|
19 | 19 | | program advisory board established under this section. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (2) "Pilot program" means the supporting life pilot |
---|
21 | 21 | | program established under this section. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) The commission shall establish the supporting life |
---|
23 | 23 | | pilot program to further the goals of the Thriving Texas Families |
---|
24 | 24 | | Program by contracting with service providers to provide care |
---|
25 | 25 | | coordination and support services to pregnant teenagers and by |
---|
26 | 26 | | establishing a centralized facility the commission owns and |
---|
27 | 27 | | operates for provision of services under the pilot program. The |
---|
28 | 28 | | commission shall operate the pilot program in a county with a |
---|
29 | 29 | | population of 4 million or more. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (c) The pilot program services must include: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (1) housing services; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) child care services for children 36 months of age |
---|
33 | 33 | | and younger; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (3) early childhood or prekindergarten educational |
---|
35 | 35 | | services; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (4) services provided by a community health worker, as |
---|
37 | 37 | | defined by Section 48.001; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (5) the provision of educational materials on |
---|
39 | 39 | | pregnancy and parenting; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (6) the provision of counseling and therapy services |
---|
41 | 41 | | for pregnant individuals and parents; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (7) the provision of parenting classes; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (8) services designed to support access to educational |
---|
44 | 44 | | opportunities for pregnant individuals and parents, including by |
---|
45 | 45 | | coordinating with counseling and planning services for trade or |
---|
46 | 46 | | vocational schools and institutions of higher education, as defined |
---|
47 | 47 | | by Section 61.003, Education Code; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (9) the provision of group activities involving |
---|
49 | 49 | | community, educational, recreational, or social functions to |
---|
50 | 50 | | promote the health and well-being of families. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (d) The commission shall operate the pilot program in |
---|
52 | 52 | | consultation with the supporting life pilot program advisory board. |
---|
53 | 53 | | The advisory board is composed of five members appointed by the |
---|
54 | 54 | | executive commissioner. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (e) The commission, in consultation with the advisory |
---|
56 | 56 | | board, shall hire an executive director. The executive director |
---|
57 | 57 | | shall manage the pilot program, including hiring personnel and |
---|
58 | 58 | | managing a budget for the pilot program. |
---|
59 | 59 | | (f) The executive commissioner by rule shall establish |
---|
60 | 60 | | minimum qualifications for an individual serving as the executive |
---|
61 | 61 | | director under Subsection (e). |
---|
62 | 62 | | (g) To be eligible to participate in the pilot program, an |
---|
63 | 63 | | individual must: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (1) be 11 years of age or older but younger than 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | years of age; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (2) be expecting a child or be the parent of a child |
---|
67 | 67 | | who is 36 months of age or younger; and |
---|
68 | 68 | | (3) have resided in the county in which the pilot |
---|
69 | 69 | | program operates for at least one year before applying to |
---|
70 | 70 | | participate in the pilot program. |
---|
71 | 71 | | (h) In evaluating applications for participation in the |
---|
72 | 72 | | pilot program, the commission, in consultation with the advisory |
---|
73 | 73 | | board, shall prioritize unhoused individuals who meet the |
---|
74 | 74 | | eligibility requirements described by Subsection (g). |
---|
75 | 75 | | (i) Not later than December 1 of each year, the commission, |
---|
76 | 76 | | in consultation with the advisory board, shall prepare and submit |
---|
77 | 77 | | to the legislature a written report on: |
---|
78 | 78 | | (1) the outcomes of participants receiving services |
---|
79 | 79 | | under the pilot program; |
---|
80 | 80 | | (2) trends in the coordination of care and the use and |
---|
81 | 81 | | availability of support services with the implementation of the |
---|
82 | 82 | | pilot program; and |
---|
83 | 83 | | (3) any recommendations for legislative or other |
---|
84 | 84 | | action. |
---|
85 | 85 | | (j) The pilot program terminates, the advisory board is |
---|
86 | 86 | | abolished, and this section expires January 1, 2032. |
---|
87 | 87 | | SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2026, the executive |
---|
88 | 88 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
89 | 89 | | appoint the supporting life pilot program advisory board members as |
---|
90 | 90 | | required by Section 54.012(d), Health and Safety Code, as added by |
---|
91 | 91 | | this Act. |
---|
92 | 92 | | SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2027, the executive |
---|
93 | 93 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
94 | 94 | | establish the supporting life pilot program as required by Section |
---|
95 | 95 | | 54.012, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, including by |
---|
96 | 96 | | adopting rules as necessary to implement that section. |
---|
97 | 97 | | SECTION 4. Notwithstanding Section 54.012(i), Health and |
---|
98 | 98 | | Safety Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services |
---|
99 | 99 | | Commission and the supporting life pilot program advisory board |
---|
100 | 100 | | shall submit the first report required by that subsection not later |
---|
101 | 101 | | than December 1, 2027. |
---|
102 | 102 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|