Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3989 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R14160 MPF-D
 By: Walle H.B. No. 3989




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the supporting life pilot program
 as part of the Thriving Texas Families Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 54, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 Chapter 1033 (S.B. 24), Acts of the 88th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2023, is amended by adding Section 54.012 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 54.012.  SUPPORTING LIFE PILOT PROGRAM. (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Advisory board" means the supporting life pilot
 program advisory board established under this section.
 (2)  "Pilot program" means the supporting life pilot
 program established under this section.
 (b)  The commission shall establish the supporting life
 pilot program to further the goals of the Thriving Texas Families
 Program by contracting with service providers to provide care
 coordination and support services to pregnant teenagers and by
 establishing a centralized facility the commission owns and
 operates for provision of services under the pilot program. The
 commission shall operate the pilot program in a county with a
 population of 4 million or more.
 (c)  The pilot program services must include:
 (1)  housing services;
 (2)  child care services for children 36 months of age
 and younger;
 (3)  early childhood or prekindergarten educational
 services;
 (4)  services provided by a community health worker, as
 defined by Section 48.001;
 (5)  the provision of educational materials on
 pregnancy and parenting;
 (6)  the provision of counseling and therapy services
 for pregnant individuals and parents;
 (7)  the provision of parenting classes;
 (8)  services designed to support access to educational
 opportunities for pregnant individuals and parents, including by
 coordinating with counseling and planning services for trade or
 vocational schools and institutions of higher education, as defined
 by Section 61.003, Education Code; and
 (9)  the provision of group activities involving
 community, educational, recreational, or social functions to
 promote the health and well-being of families.
 (d)  The commission shall operate the pilot program in
 consultation with the supporting life pilot program advisory board.
 The advisory board is composed of five members appointed by the
 executive commissioner.
 (e)  The commission, in consultation with the advisory
 board, shall hire an executive director. The executive director
 shall manage the pilot program, including hiring personnel and
 managing a budget for the pilot program.
 (f)  The executive commissioner by rule shall establish
 minimum qualifications for an individual serving as the executive
 director under Subsection (e).
 (g)  To be eligible to participate in the pilot program, an
 individual must:
 (1)  be 11 years of age or older but younger than 21
 years of age;
 (2)  be expecting a child or be the parent of a child
 who is 36 months of age or younger; and
 (3)  have resided in the county in which the pilot
 program operates for at least one year before applying to
 participate in the pilot program.
 (h)  In evaluating applications for participation in the
 pilot program, the commission, in consultation with the advisory
 board, shall prioritize unhoused individuals who meet the
 eligibility requirements described by Subsection (g).
 (i)  Not later than December 1 of each year, the commission,
 in consultation with the advisory board, shall prepare and submit
 to the legislature a written report on:
 (1)  the outcomes of participants receiving services
 under the pilot program;
 (2)  trends in the coordination of care and the use and
 availability of support services with the implementation of the
 pilot program; and
 (3)  any recommendations for legislative or other
 action.
 (j)  The pilot program terminates, the advisory board is
 abolished, and this section expires January 1, 2032.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2026, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 appoint the supporting life pilot program advisory board members as
 required by Section 54.012(d), Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than January 1, 2027, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 establish the supporting life pilot program as required by Section
 54.012, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, including by
 adopting rules as necessary to implement that section.
 SECTION 4.  Notwithstanding Section 54.012(i), Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services
 Commission and the supporting life pilot program advisory board
 shall submit the first report required by that subsection not later
 than December 1, 2027.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.