Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4112 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/03/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars