Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4166 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025 9:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:44PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:52PM
04/14/2025 9:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:44PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:52PM