Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4176 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/09/2025 10:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar