Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote | RV#552 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote RV#552 | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1867 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 1555 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) | Journal Page: 1543 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 880 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 351 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 351 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |