Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB422 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/09/2025
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/23/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House
04/08/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Vote taken in committee
03/12/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/12/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars