LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB4233
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB4233
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB4233
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/07/2025
10:00 am
Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB3803
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB3804
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB3805
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB3806
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB3833
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4134
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB4233
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4238
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB4243
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in committee