Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Economic Development | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 874 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1301 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1195 | Journal Page: 2555 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2555 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 1-McLaughlin | Journal Page: 2555 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2555 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 874 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Filed |