House | 05/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1465 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2843 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2466 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 878 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 878 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Filed |