Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB44 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/07/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 7:41PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment as amended
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment as amended
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment as amended
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in committee