Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4417 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025 10:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
04/14/2025 10:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)