House | 05/08/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Record vote | RV#1825 | |
House | 05/08/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3243 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1720 | Journal Page: 3243 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3243 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote RV#1720 | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Amended | 1-Darby | Journal Page: 3243 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3242 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Amended 1-Darby | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1937 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 903 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Filed |