Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4437 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2025
Fiscal Note March 11, 2025

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2025
Fiscal Note April 25, 2025
Analysis April 25, 2025
Witness List April 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note April 8, 2025